Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Kimberlee Rae Tsai, Winn Law Group, against Charles E Payton, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with David E. Gregory presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 03, 2020 |
CategoryCollection Crc 3.740-Under $10,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Substitution of Attorney
Date: October 07, 2021System Generated Notice re: Order to Show Cause Hearing.
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Declaration of PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL REGARDING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: October 08, 2021Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion
Date: November 01, 2021System Generated Notice re: Department Assignment.
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Declaration of /re: underlying action of accounts stated
Date: May 20, 2021Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92223-3332.
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Default Judgment
Date: May 28, 2021Declaration of /in Support of Judgment CCP 1033
Date: May 20, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Declaration of /re: waiver of attorney fees
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing
Date: November 01, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of DISCOVER BANK
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of DISCOVER BANK and filed.
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Moreno Valley)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.