Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Winn Law Group, against Juanita J Harris, represented by Unrepresented, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 02, 2020 |
CategoryCollection Crc 3.740-Under $10,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Declaration of /re: waiver of attorney fees
Date: March 12, 2021Declaration of /in support of Judgment CCP 1033
Date: March 12, 2021System Generated Notice re: Department Assignment.
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: March 12, 2021Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92571-7342.
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of DISCOVER BANK and filed.
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Declaration of /re: underlying action of account stated
Date: March 12, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of DISCOVER BANK
Date: December 01, 2020Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Moreno Valley)
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: Order to Show Cause Hearing.
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00Default Judgment
Date: March 15, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.