Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
First Republic Trust Company, Hellquist, Anne, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case represented by Bassi, Michael B., Braccini, Steven P, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts Superior with Virginia M. George presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVirginia M. George Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 29, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Petition in Re: Petition for Probate of Copy of Will and for Letters of Administration with Will Annexed Judge: George, Virginia M |
|
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Petition in Re: Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary Judge: George, Virginia M |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Petition in Re: Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters of Administration with Will Annexed by Anne Hellquist filed 10/29/21 Judge: George, Virginia M |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Petition in Re: Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters Testamentary filed by First Republic Trust Company filed 03/09/22 Judge: George, Virginia M |
|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of: Order |
|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Filing Re: JOINT STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF 1-13-23 HEARING |
|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: GRANTING STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF 1-13-23 HEARING : 3-14-23 9AM D30 |
|
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notes Joint stipulation for continuance of January 13, 2023 hearing signed and ready for pick up in room 210. |
|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notes Stipluation and order to continue hearing date forwarded to Room 210 |
|
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Lodge Order/Judgment Joint Stipulation for Continuance of January 13, 2023 hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.