Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Albers, Herrmann, Bianca, Kalinna, Susan, Public Administrator, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case represented by County Counsel, Hancock, Scott A, Peoples, Ronald Scott, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 22, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMarch 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | MSP19-01738 ESTATE OF ELIZABETH AURELIA BARTOK 9:00 AM HEARING ON PETITION IN RE: SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN RESPONSE TO COURT'S TENTATIVE RULING AND VERIFIED REVISED FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT FILED ON... | |
February 08, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | MSP19-01738 ESTATE OF ELIZABETH AURELIA BARTOK 9:00 AM HEARING ON PETITION IN RE: SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION IN RESPONSE TO COURT'S TENTATIVE RULING AND VERIFIED REVISED FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT FILED ON... | |
May 09, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | MSP19-01738 ESTATE OF ELIZABETH AURELIA BARTOK 9:00 AM HEARING ON PETITION IN RE: FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF ADMIN, PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT, ATTY FEES, COMPENSATION, AND FOR DISTRIBUTION FI... | |
January 12, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | MSP19-01738 ESTATE OF ELIZABETH AURELIA BARTOK 9:00 AM HEARING ON PETITION IN RE: FIRST AND FINAL ACCOUNT AND REPORT OF ADMIN, PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT, ATTY FEES, COMPENSATION, AND FOR DISTRIBUTION FI... | |
February 08, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | MSP19-01738 ESTATE OF ELIZABETH AURELIA BARTOK RE: PET’N TO DETERMINE HEIRSHIP FILED ON 05/14/21 BY BIANCA HERRMANN Need: 1. Appearances 2. Proof of mailing to Christine Schmidtchen at address in Firs... | |
November 16, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | MSP19-01738 ESTATE OF ELIZABETH AURELIA BARTOK RE: PET’N FOR DETERMINATION OF ENTITLEMENT TO ESTATE DISTRIBUTION FILED ON 07/23/21 BY SUSAN KALINNA, DORI ALBERS (LUDWIG) Need: 1. Appearances 2. Proof ... | |
October 07, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | MSP19-01738 ESTATE OF ELIZABETH AURELIA BARTOK RE: PET’N TO DETERMINE HEIRSHIP FILED ON 05/14/21 BY BIANCA HERRMANN Need: 1. Appearances 2. Proof of mailing to Christine Schmidtchen at address in Firs... | |
March 17, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
FILED ON 01/29/20 BY JANET WELBORN --Drop—it appears this matter was granted 11-10-20 DORI ALBERS (LUDWIG) RONALD SCOTT PEOPLES ELIZABETH AURELIA BARTOK JANET WELBORN BARBARA J BENDER PUBLIC ADMINISTR...
Judge: Fenstermacher |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.