Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bowen, Roberta, Cohn, George Richard, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case represented by Pastor, Nathan D., Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 24, 2018 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | MSP18-01726 ESTATE OF RICHARD COHN SR RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED ON 08/27/21 BY GEORGE RICHARD COHN --Drop, Substitution of Attorney filed 10-4-21-- Parties: Attorneys: GEORGE RICHARD ... | |
January 12, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
FILED ON 12/13/18 Need appearance Examiners have received a telephone request for continuance from George Cohn
Judge: Fenstermacher |
|
November 17, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
FILED ON 12/13/18 BY ROBERTA BOWEN PROBATE EXAMINER NOTES-SUBJECT TO REVISION AFTER REVIEW BY THE JUDGE Need appearances FILED ON 03/01/19 BY ROBERT S MARVIN PROBATE EXAMINER NOTES-SUBJECT TO REVISION...
Judge: Fenstermacher |
|
August 13, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
FILED ON 12/13/18 BY ROBERTA BOWEN PROBATE EXAMINER NOTES-SUBJECT TO REVISION AFTER REVIEW BY THE JUDGE Need appearances
Judge: Fenstermacher |
|
May 14, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
FILED ON 12/13/18 BY ROBERTA BOWEN Need: 1. Appearances. This is a competing petition. 2. Verified declaration by petitioner to clarify ages of petitioner and decedent at time of registration of domes...
Judge: John Sugiyama |
|
February 28, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
FILED ON 12/13/18 BY ROBERTA BOWEN Need: 1. Appearances. This is a competing petition. 2. Verified declaration by petitioner to clarify ages of petitioner and decedent at time of registration of domes...
Judge: John Sugiyama |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.