Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 13, 2016 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
FILED ON 12/18/19 BY LAWRENCE WIESER Need: 1. Proof of mailing Notice of Hearing to all parties entitled to notice. (Service list not attached to Notice of Hearing as alleged.) BRYAN SMYTH ERYN SMYTH ...
Judge: John Sugiyama |
|
May 30, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
FILED ON 01/03/19 BY LAWRENCE WIESER Need: 1. Appearance to report status of settlement 2. Proof of service in the manner provided in CCP § 415.10 (30 days personal service) or CCP § 415.30 (30 days p...
Judge: John Sugiyama |
|
March 19, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
FILED ON 01/03/19 BY LAWRENCE WIESER --See 8.C.-- Need: Proof of mailing to Manual Oliveira individually not c/o someone or proof of written instructions to that effect. CRC § 7.51(a) Need: 1. Appeara...
Judge: John Sugiyama |
|
February 28, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
FILED ON 11/07/17 BY FRED WIESER PROBATE EXAMINER NOTES-SUBJECT TO REVISION AFTER REVIEW BY THE JUDGE Need: 1. Appearance to report status of settlement 2. Proposed Order Notes: A. Response and Object...
Judge: John Sugiyama |
|
December 13, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
FILED ON 11/07/17 BY FRED WIESER Need: 1. Appearance to report status of settlement 2. Proposed Order Notes: A. Response and Objection filed by Lawrence Weiser 6-14-18. B. Joinder filed by Eryn Smyth ...
Judge: John Sugiyama |
|
September 18, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
FILED ON 06/07/18 BY FRED WIESER Need: 1. Appearances to report status 2. Verified declaration by petitioner to state relationships of all persons entitled to receive notice. LR 7.112 3. Proposed Orde...
Judge: John Sugiyama |
|
July 12, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
FILED ON 11/07/17 BY FRED WIESER Need: 1. Appearance to report status, including mediation 2. Proposed Order Notes: A. Response and Objection/Petition filed 6-14-18 by Lawrence Weiser was filed only a...
Judge: John Sugiyama |
|
October 13, 2016 | Tentative Ruling |
SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE FILED ON 08/31/16 BY LAWRENCE WIESER Absent objection Petition Approved Proposed Order Submitted No Appearance Required LAWRENCE WIESER KONSTANTINE A DEMIRIS THE TRUST OF LOUISE M WI...
Judge: John Sugiyama |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.