Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Valencia, Janet Anne Baena, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Garfinkle, Gary S, against Board Of Registered Nursing, represented by Tuss, Gregory, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 21, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | MSN18-1358 CASE NAME: VALENCIA VS. BOARD OF REGISTER HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR REASONABLE ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY JANET ANNE BAENA VALENCIA RN * TENTATIVE RULING: * Petitioner’s motion for attorney fees... | |
March 02, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | MSN18-1358 CASE NAME: VALENCIA VS. BOARD OF REGISTER HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR REASONABLE ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY JANET ANNE BAENA VALENCIA RN * TENTATIVE RULING: * The motion is continued to March 9, 2... | |
March 17, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR ENFORCE UNCONTESTED COSTS FILED BY JANET ANNE BAENA VALENCIA RN * TENTATIVE RULING: * Petitioner’s motion to enforce costs is granted. Petitioner filed and served its memorand...
Judge: Jill Fannin |
|
March 03, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR ENFORCE UNCONTESTED COSTS FILED BY JANET ANNE BAENA VALENCIA RN * TENTATIVE RULING: * Continued to 3/17/21 at 9:00 am by request of parties.
Judge: Jill Fannin |
|
July 03, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
HEARING ON MOTION FOR WRIT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MANDATE FILED BY JANET ANNE BAENA VALENCIA R.N. * TENTATIVE RULING: * Petitioner Janet Anne Baena Valencia’s Motion for Writ of Administrative Mandate, pur...
Judge: Jill Fannin |
|
June 05, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR WRIT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MANDATE FILED BY JANET ANNE BAENA VALENCIA RN * TENTATIVE RULING: * The Court continues this hearing to June 12, 2019 at 9:00 a.m.
Judge: Jill Fannin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.