Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
A-L Financial Corporation, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Gardner, Lincoln D., against Love-Williams, Latonya J, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 27, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
HEARING ON MOTION TO VACATE RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY LATONYA J. LOVE-WILLIAMS * TENTATIVE RULING: * On September 26, 2020 defendant filed a motion to vacate a renewal of judgment that had been fil...
Judge: Burch |
|
January 13, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
HEARING ON MOTION TO VACATE RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED BY LATONYA J. LOVE-WILLIAMS * TENTATIVE RULING: * On September 26, 2019 the Defendant timely filed a Motion to Judgment under CCP 683.170. Her mot...
Judge: Burch |
|
August 23, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
HEARING ON ORDER OF EXAMINATION AS TO LATONYA J. LOVE-WILLIAMS * TENTATIVE RULING: * Appear.
Judge: Steve K. Austin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.