Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Warren, Craig, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Brand, Stephen S, against Warren, Kesa Renae, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Maier, Clare presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 19, 2021 |
Category26: Unlimited Other Real Property |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
*Case Management Conference
Date: October 06, 2021Motion Filed To/For
Date: December 30, 2021Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: January 13, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: December 30, 2021Declaration Re:
Date: December 30, 2021Complaint Filed - Summons Issued
Date: May 19, 2021*Case Management Conference
Date: January 19, 2022Original Summons Issued/Filed
Date: June 02, 2021Hearing set for:
Date: May 19, 2021Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: September 20, 2021Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: August 17, 2021Correspondence Memo:
Date: August 06, 2021Proof of Service
Date: June 22, 2021Update:
Date: September 20, 2021Notice of Lis Pendens Filed
Date: May 19, 2021Writ of Possession Issued
Date: April 22, 2022Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 01, 2022Motion Hearing/ Minute Order
Date: February 24, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: February 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Issued WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROP LOCATED AT 42 MILDRED AVE PITTSBURG |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession Returned ISSUE ON 4-22-23 |
|
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling and Notice of Entry of Order filed 12/5/22 Notice of/to: Ruling and Notice of Entry of Order filed 12/5/22 |
|
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: Confirming partition referee's sale of real property & related orders Order Filed Re: Confirming partition referee's sale of real property & related orders |
|
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minutes *Hearing on Motion in Re: Motion for Confirmation of Sale of Real Property filed by Partition Referee on 9/21/22 Judge: Maier, Clare |
|
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notes SIGNED ORDER CONFIRMING PARTITION REFEREE'S SALE OF REAL PROPERTY SENT TO RM 103 FOR FILING |
|
December 01, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | MSC21-01053 CASE NAME: C. WARREN VS K. WARREN *HEARING ON MOTION IN RE: MOTION FOR CONFIRMATION OF SALE OF REAL PROPERTY FILED BY PARTITION REFEREE ON 9/21/22 FILED BY: *TENTATIVE RULING:* Code of Civ... | |
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Date Re Motion of Partition Referee for Confirmation of Sale of Real Property Notice of Hearing Re: Hearing Date and Time Re Motion and Motion of Partition Referee for Confirmation of Sale of Real Property |
|
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Lodge [Proposed] Order Confirming Partition Referee's Sale of Real Property and Related Orders Lodge Order/Judgment [Proposed] Order Confirming Partition Referee's Sale of Real Property and Related Orders |
|
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Confirmation of Sale of Real Property filed by Partition Referee on 9/21/22 Motion Filed To/For |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.