Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Manuel G. Lopez, And Helen J. Kei, Trustees Of The Kei Lopez Family Trust Dated July 9, 2019, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Richards, John S., against Freeman, Dana E., Freeman, Gregory S., represented by Estavillo, Jason W., in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts Superior with Douglas, Danielle K presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 18, 2021 |
Category26: Unlimited Other Real Property |
Last RefreshedFebruary 11, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Declaration Re:
Date: August 02, 2021Amended
Date: August 02, 2021Notice of/to:
Date: August 05, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 05, 2021Objection to:
Date: August 06, 2021Objection to:
Date: August 06, 2021Supplemental Filed Re:
Date: August 06, 2021Correspondence Memo:
Date: August 11, 2021Supplemental Filed Re:
Date: August 06, 2021Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 06, 2021Correspondence Memo:
Date: September 10, 2021Answer to:
Date: August 13, 2021Special Set Hearing
Date: August 13, 2021Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: November 24, 2021Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: December 01, 2021*
Date: September 13, 2021*Further Case Management Conference
Date: December 13, 2021Motion Filed To/For
Date: February 01, 2022Declaration Re:
Date: February 01, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: February 01, 2022Declaration Re:
Date: April 14, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: April 01, 2021*
Date: April 01, 2021*
Date: April 02, 2021Opposition to:
Date: April 01, 2021Proof of Electronic Service
Date: April 01, 2021Declaration Re:
Date: April 01, 2021Declaration Re:
Date: April 01, 2021Notice of/to:
Date: April 14, 2021Proof of Electronic Service
Date: April 01, 2021Complaint Filed - Summons Issued
Date: March 18, 2021Hearing set for:
Date: March 18, 2021Original Summons Issued/Filed
Date: March 18, 2021Proof of Electronic Service
Date: April 14, 2021Declaration Re:
Date: April 01, 2021Declaration Re:
Date: April 14, 2021*
Date: April 28, 2021Opposition to:
Date: April 28, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: April 14, 2021*
Date: April 28, 2021Declaration Re:
Date: April 28, 2021*
Date: April 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
February 09, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | MSC21-00569 CASE NAME: LOPEZ/KEI VS FREEMAN *HEARING ON MOTION IN RE: AN ORDER TO RELEASE AND RETURN BOND TO DEF. FILED BY: *TENTATIVE RULING:* The motion for an order to release and return bond to De... | |
December 08, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | MSC21-00569 CASE NAME: LOPEZ/KEI VS FREEMAN *HEARING ON MOTION IN RE: MOTION FOR AND ORDER TO RELEASE AND RETURN BOND TO DEF FILED BY DEF ON 9/20/23 FILED BY: FREEMAN, GREGORY S. *TENTATIVE RULING:* T... | |
September 18, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | MSC21-00569 CASE NAME: LOPEZ/KEI VS FREEMAN *HEARING ON MOTION IN RE: DETERMINE PARTY PREVAILING ON CONTRACT & TO FIX AMOUNT OF ATTNY FEES FILED BY: MANUEL G. LOPEZ, AND HELEN J. KEI, TRUSTEES OF THE ... | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
*Hearing on Motion in Re: BREACH OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT & ENFORCEMENT |
|
July 10, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | MSC21-00569 CASE NAME: LOPEZ/KEI VS FREEMAN *HEARING ON MOTION IN RE: BREACH OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FILED BY: *TENTATIVE RULING:* Before the Court is Defendants’ Motion for Breach of Settlement Agree... | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
*Hearing on Motion in Re: TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT |
|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
*Hearing on Motion in Re: TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT |
|
May 22, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | MSC21-00569 CASE NAME: LOPEZ/KEI VS FREEMAN *HEARING ON MOTION IN RE: TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT FILED BY: MANUEL G. LOPEZ, AND HELEN J. KEI, TRUSTEES OF THE KEI LOPEZ FAMILY TRUST DATED JULY 9, 2019 *TENT... |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.