Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Berrios, Jenilee, Berrios, Jesus, Hernandez-Perez, Sandra, filed a(n) case represented by Brandi, Thomas J, Weiss, William E, against Caltrans, Fairfield Cycle Center, Inc., Harley-Davidson Motor Company Group, Llc, State Of California, represented by Arakawa, Dale A, Clinton, David A, Lonnie, Dommond E, Love, Rosemary I, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts Superior with Charles S. Treat presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles S. Treat Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2020 |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Complaint Filed - Summons Issued
Date: June 30, 2020Amended Complaint Filed
Date: September 21, 2020Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: November 02, 2020Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: January 29, 2021Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: October 30, 2020Fee Received for:
Date: October 02, 2020Answer to:
Date: November 02, 2020Correspondence Memo:
Date: October 29, 2020*Case Management Conference
Date: November 17, 2020Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: January 26, 2021*
Date: January 26, 2021Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: January 29, 2021Hearing set for:
Date: June 30, 2020Original Summons Issued/Filed
Date: June 30, 2020*Further Case Management Conference
Date: February 17, 2021Fee Received for:
Date: January 26, 2021*
Date: October 02, 2020*
Date: January 11, 2021Request Filed and Partial Dismissal Entered
Date: January 22, 2021*
Date: March 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | MSC20-01144 CASE NAME: HERNANDEZ-PEREZ VS CALTRANS *HEARING ON MOTION IN RE: MOTION OF CRSS-DEF FOR NON-MONETARY SANCTIONS DISMISSING S.A.C.C PER CCP 128.7 FILED BY CRSS-DEF ON 7/11/23 FILED BY: JAMES... | |
April 13, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | MSC20-01144 CASE NAME: HERNANDEZ-PEREZ VS CALTRANS HEARING IN RE: MOTION TO SET ASIDE ORDER ON DEMURRER (PER EX PARTE 3/15/23) FILED BY: FAIRFIELD CYCLE CENTER, INC. *TENTATIVE RULING:* Cross-Defendan... | |
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
*Further Case Management Conference
Judge: Maier, Clare |
|
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Demurrer to: Demurrer to Amended Cross Complaint of Fairfield Cycle Center filed by Edwin James Jr on 12/8/22 Judge: Maier, Clare |
|
March 02, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | MSC20-01144 CASE NAME: HERNANDEZ-PEREZ VS CALTRANS HEARING ON DEMURRER TO: AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT OF FAIRFIELD CYCLE CENTER FILED BY EDWIN JAMES JR ON 12/8/22 FILED BY: JAMES, EDWIN, JR. *TENTATIVE R... | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Answer/Response/Denial of Harley Davidson Motor Company to X Cmplnt of Fairfield Cycle Ctr Answer/Response/Denial - No Fee Answer/Response/Denial of Harley Davidson Motor Company to 1st Amended X Cmplnt of Fairfield Cycle Ctr |
|
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notes Answer of Harley Davidson Filed |
|
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Demurrer to Amended Cross Complaint of Fairfield Cycle Center Filed by Edwin James, Jr on 12/8/22 Demurrer to Cross Complaint Judge: Charles S. Treat |
|
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail Demurrer, mailed on 12/8/22 Judge: Charles S. Treat |
|
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Stephen Sayad Re: Compliance w/ CCP 430.41 Declaration of Stephen Sayad Re: Compliance w/ CCP 430.41 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.