Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Wang, Judy, Wang, Richard L.T., Wang, Rose Hsu, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Tenney, Beth C, against Andersen Windows, Inc. A Minnesota Corporation, Bill Doss Heating & Air Conditioning, Inc. A California Corporation, Branagh Development, Inc, Brasso'S Plumbing,Inc A California Corporation, Castro, Joseph M., (total of 29) See All represented by Borbely, Thomas E, Dove, Mark S., Fife, Paul D, Fischer, Todd A, Giavinovich, Natalie, (total of 14) See All in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 23, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | MSC18-00603 CASE NAME: WANG VS. BRANAGH DEVELOPMENT *HEARING ON MOTION IN RE: GFS BTWN TRUCREW AND WANG FILED BY: TRUCREW, INC. , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION *TENTATIVE RULING:* Defendant TruCrew, Inc. m... | |
September 28, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | MSC18-00603 CASE NAME: WANG VS. BRANAGH DEVELOPMENT *HEARING ON MOTION IN RE: GFS BETWEEN HIGH END DEVELOPMENT, JAMES METZGER AND ANTHONY A. FROYD FILED BY: HIGH END DEVELOPMENT, INC. *TENTATIVE RULIN... | |
August 31, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | MSC18-00603 CASE NAME: WANG VS. BRANAGH DEVELOPMENT *HEARING ON MOTION IN RE: GFS BETWEEN PADILLA AND WANG FILED BY: PADILLA, RALPH *TENTATIVE RULING:* The motion of Ralph Padilla and Padilla Construc... | |
August 03, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | MSC18-00603 CASE NAME: WANG VS. BRANAGH DEVELOPMENT *HEARING ON MOTION IN RE: FOR DGFS BETWEEN BRANAGH DEV AND WANG FILED BY: BRANAGH DEVELOPMENT, INC *TENTATIVE RULING:* The unopposed good-faith sett... | |
July 20, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | MSC18-00603 CASE NAME: WANG VS. BRANAGH DEVELOPMENT *HEARING ON MOTION IN RE: DGFS BETWEEN DEF ASK WINDOWS, PLTFS RICHARD AND ROSE WANG AND X-COMPLAINANT BRANAGH DEV INC. FILED BY: KREUSCHER, ALAN SCO... | |
June 22, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | MSC18-00603 CASE NAME: WANG VS. BRANAGH DEVELOPMENT *HEARING ON MOTION IN RE: GFS BETWEEN MORCON AND BENCHMARK INSURANCE FILED BY: BENCHMARK INSURANCE COMPANY OBO MORCON, INC A SUSPENDED CORPORATION *... | |
May 25, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | MSC18-00603 CASE NAME: WANG VS. BRANAGH DEVELOPMENT HEARING ON SUMMARY MOTION TO PLTFS 4TH AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY: PADILLA, RALPH PADILLA *TENTATIVE RULING:* Defendant Ralph Padilla’s motion for s... | |
April 27, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | MSC18-00603 CASE NAME: WANG VS. BRANAGH DEVELOPMENT *HEARING ON MOTION IN RE: DGFS FILED BY: MORENO, DEREK EDWARD *TENTATIVE RULING:* The application of Intervenor Benchmark Insurance (on behalf of Mo... | |
March 09, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | MSC18-00603 CASE NAME: WANG VS. BRANAGH DEVELOPMENT *HEARING ON MOTION IN RE: GFS FILED BY: ANDERSON, DALE G. *TENTATIVE RULING:* Defendant Dale Anderson moves for a determination that the settlement ... | |
December 29, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | MSC18-00603 CASE NAME: WANG VS. BRANAGH DEVELOPMENT HEARING ON MOTION RE DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY: ROYALITE MFG ., INC. *TENTATIVE RULING:* Granted. The moving papers establish ... |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.