Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Henry Matoza Construction, Inc A California Corporation Aos: Rod Quigley filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
SPECIAL SET HEARING ON: MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT SET BY DEPT 33 * TENTATIVE RULING: * Appear by Zoom.
Judge: Steve K. Austin |
|
December 28, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY CTO REALTY, INC. * TENTATIVE RULING: * Introduction Defendants Keller Williams Realty and Marianne Bordogna’s Motion for Summary Judgment is denied. In ...
Judge: Burch |
|
October 26, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
HEARING ON MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY HENRY MATOZA CONSTRUCTION, INC. * TENTATIVE RULING: * On August 14, 2020 defendant Henry Matoza Construction, Inc., (hereafter “De...
Judge: Burch |
|
October 05, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE * TENTATIVE RULING: * CMC to be conducted in light of ruling set out in Line #2 below.
Judge: Burch |
|
September 14, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY CTO REALTY, INC. * TENTATIVE RULING: * On the court’s own motion, the hearing on this motion is continued to October 5, 2020 at 9:00 a.m.
Judge: Burch |
|
September 19, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
HEARING ON MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES FILED BY ELI MATOZA * TENTATIVE RULING: * Denied. The Defendants in the Matoza matter are not presently named as Defendants in the Homecraft case. Although both ...
Judge: Steve K. Austin |
|
March 04, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
HEARING ON DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ELIJAH D. MATOZA * TENTATIVE RULING: * The demurrer filed by Defendant Elijah Matoza (“Matoza”) is sustained in part and overruled in part. SUMMARY OF THE COM...
Judge: Susanne Fenstermacher |
|
January 28, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
HEARING ON DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ELIJAH D. MATOZA * TENTATIVE RULING: * Defendant Elijah Matoza’s demurrer to Plaintiff’s complaint is rescheduled for March 4, 2019 in order for Defendant to ...
Judge: Susanne Fenstermacher |
|
December 10, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT IF ENTERED FILED BY ELIJAH D. MATOZA * TENTATIVE RULING: * Defendant Eli Matoza’s motion to set aside default is granted, as it is essentially unopp...
Judge: Susanne Fenstermacher |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.