Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Nicholas, Irvin D, Nicholson, Kathleen A, Scarpelli, Janet L, Scarpelli, Michael P, Tiernan, Marilyn, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Civil case represented by Signorotti, Dominic V, against All Persons Unknown, Claiming Any Legal Or Equitable Right, Title, Estate, Lien, Or In Terest In The Property Described In The Com, Ambrose, Ngoc Anh, Ambrose, Paul R, Becker, Joanne L, Becker, Leonard S, (total of 38) See All represented by Epstein, Mark D, Seibert, Esq., Hal F., Stephenson, Michael O, Velyvis, Stephen E, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 04, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | MSC17-02529 CASE NAME: TIERNAN VS. DIABLO COMMUNITY SERVS *HEARING ON MOTION IN RE: MOTION FILED TO SET ASIDE STIPULATED JUDGMENT FILED BY: *TENTATIVE RULING:* Before the Court is a motion to set asid... | |
February 04, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | MSC17-02529 CASE NAME: TIERNAN VS. DIABLO COMMUNITY HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION / FILED BY JEFF MINI * TENTATIVE RULING: * Before the Court is a motion for summary j... | |
March 04, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
SPECIAL SET HEARING ON: SEE RELATED CASE C18-01698 SET BY DEPT 33 * TENTATIVE RULING: * See Line 1. **If oral argument is requested, contact Dept. 33 and opposing counsel by 4pm. Oral argument will be...
Judge: Steve K. Austin |
|
February 19, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
HEARING ON DEMURRER TO 1st Amended COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION FILED BY WINSTON CERVANTES * TENTATIVE RULING: * Before the Court is a demurrer by Winston Cervantes ("Demurrer") to the First Amended Comp...
Judge: Barry Baskin |
|
November 06, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT CCP 644.6 FILED BY WINSTON CERVANTES * TENTATIVE RULING: * Executive Summary Lines 1, 2, and 3 of this week’s calendar all arise in this action. T...
Judge: Charles Treat |
|
October 23, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT CCP 644.6 FILED BY WINSTON CERVANTES * TENTATIVE RULING: * This motion was continued last week to November 6. All parties are informed that effect...
Judge: Charles Treat |
|
October 16, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
HEARING ON DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION of MINI FILED BY WINSTON CERVANTES * TENTATIVE RULING: * This motion is continued to November 6, as are the motions calendared for next week (summary j...
Judge: Charles Treat |
|
September 06, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS FILED BY ROBERT TIERNAN, et al. * TENTATIVE RULING: * Plaintiff’s motion for attorney fees is denied. This case involved rights of access to Calle Arroy...
Judge: Charles Treat |
|
December 14, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE * TENTATIVE RULING: * Counsel to appear at 10:00 a.m. for CMC.
Judge: Charles Treat |
|
November 09, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AS TO THEIR 1ST CAUSE OF ACTION FOR U FILED BY ROBERT TIERNAN, ROBERT TIERNAN, MARILYN * TENTATIVE RULING: * Plaintiff Robert Tiernan, et al. file this motio...
Judge: Charles Treat |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.