Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Goldman, Mitchell, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Schuman, Jeanne, against Graydon, Ronald, Orinda Academy, North Bay Secondary School, Inc., A Corporation, represented by Travelstead, Timothy C, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
HEARING ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT / FILED BY MITCHELL GOLDMAN * TENTATIVE RULING: * Plaintiff Mitchell Goldman’s Motion for Reconsider of Court’s Decision in Gra...
Judge: Steve K. Austin |
|
July 25, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION FILED BY ORINDA ACADEMY, NORTH BAY SECONDARY * TENTATIVE RULING: * Defendant Orinda Academy’s motion for summary judgment is granted. SUM...
Judge: Steve K. Austin |
|
April 11, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
HEARING ON MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES FILED BY ORINDA ACADEMY, et al. * TENTATIVE RULING: * Appear to discuss the appointment of a Discovery Referee pursuant to CCP §639.
Judge: Steve K. Austin |
|
March 07, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER DESIGNATING DOCUMENTS AS CONFIDENTIAL FILED BY ORINDA ACADEMY, et al. * TENTATIVE RULING: * Granted. After In Camera review of the Accreditation Reports, the Court finds th...
Judge: Steve K. Austin |
|
February 21, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE * TENTATIVE RULING: * Appear.
Judge: Steve K. Austin |
|
December 13, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGS. FILED BY MITCHELL GOLDMAN * TENTATIVE RULING: * Appear.
Judge: Steve K. Austin |
|
February 15, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
HEARING ON DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT of GOLDMAN FILED BY ORINDA ACADEMY, NORTH BAY SECONDARY, RONALD GRAYDON * TENTATIVE RULING: * Defendants Orinda Academy, North Bay Secondary School, Inc. and Ronald Gr...
Judge: Steve K. Austin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.