Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 23, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL DEPO OF PERSON QUALIFIED & PROD OF DOCS, FILED BY VERONICA DE LA CRUZ, ROSALINDA DE LA CRUZ, THE * TENTATIVE RULING: * The court is inclined to send all discovery matte...
Judge: Jill Fannin |
|
August 28, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCS. & PRIVILEGE LOG FILED BY VERONICA DE LA CRUZ, et al. * TENTATIVE RULING: * Plaintiff’s motion to compel production of documents and privilege log is den...
Judge: Jill Fannin |
|
April 24, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS & PRIVILEGE LOG FILED BY VERONICA DE LA CRUZ, et al. * TENTATIVE RULING: * Plaintiff’s motion to compel is denied without prejudice due the parties’...
Judge: Jill Fannin |
|
March 22, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCS. & PRIVILEGE LOG FILED BY VERONICA DE LA CRUZ, et al. * TENTATIVE RULING: * This case was routinely reassigned from Department 15 to Department 12. It wa...
Judge: Charles Treat |
|
December 04, 2017 | Tentative Ruling |
HEARING ON MOTION TO DELETE PORTIONS OF 1st Amended COMPLAINT FILED BY MANORCARE OF WALNUT CREEK CA, LLC, et al. * TENTATIVE RULING: * The Motion to Strike filed by Defendants Manor Care of Walnut Cre...
Judge: Ed Weil |
|
October 18, 2017 | Tentative Ruling |
HEARING ON DEMURRER TO 1st Amended COMPLAINT of DE LA CRUZ FILED BY DR. PEDRAM TAHER, M.D. * TENTATIVE RULING: * Continued by stipulation to 11/29/17, 9:00 a.m., Dept. 9.
Judge: Judith Craddick |
|
September 22, 2017 | Tentative Ruling |
HEARING ON DEMURRER TO 1st Amended COMPLAINT of DE LA CRUZ FILED BY DR. PEDRAM TAHER, M.D. * TENTATIVE RULING: * Department 12 has recused itself in this case pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure § 170...
Judge: Charles Treat |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.