Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Affinito, Mary, Affinito, Michelle, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Davis, Josh P, against Affinito, Michael, Hendrickson, Roger, Rurik Trust Company, represented by Vaught, Jon R, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 17, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | MSC17-00286 CASE NAME: AFFINITO VS. AFFINITO *HEARING ON MOTION IN RE: MOTION TO TAX COSTS FILED BY PLN ON 9/20/23 FILED BY: AFFINITO, MARY *TENTATIVE RULING:* The Court grants the motion to tax costs... | |
October 05, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | MSC17-00286 CASE NAME: AFFINITO VS. AFFINITO *HEARING ON MOTION IN RE: NOTICE OF INTENTION OF PLAINTIFFS TO MOVE TO VACATE THE JUDGMENT FILED BY PLN ON 7/20/23 FILED BY: AFFINITO, MARY *TENTATIVE RULI... | |
September 29, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | MSC17-00286 CASE NAME: AFFINITO VS. AFFINITO HEARING ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION TO RE DOE NO. 4 FILED BY PLAINTIFFS *TENTATIVE RULING:* Plaintiffs’ motion for reconsideration is granted in part. Th... | |
August 22, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | MSC17-00286 CASE NAME: AFFINITO VS. AFFINITO HEARING ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION TO SUBSTITUTE MICHAEL JAMES GUITARD, MANAGING AGENT OF DEFENDANT RURIK, AS DOE NO. 4 *TENTATIVE RULING:* This motion ... | |
August 15, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | MSC17-00286 CASE NAME: AFFINITO VS. AFFINITO JURY TRIAL *TENTATIVE RULING:* Parties to appear and be ready for jury trial. A failure to appear may result in the imposition of sanctions. | |
June 20, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | MSC17-00286 CASE NAME: AFFINITO VS. AFFINITO HEARING ON MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE MICHAEL JAMES GUITARD AS DOE 4 FILED BY PLAINTIFFS *TENTATIVE RULING:* Plaintiffs’ motion to substitute Michael Guitard int... | |
May 16, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | MSC17-00286 CASE NAME: AFFINITO VS. AFFINITO HEARING IN RE: HEARING FOR DEFAULTED DEFENDANTS *TENTATIVE RULING:* Parties to appear and be ready for hearing. Failure to appear may result in imposition ... | |
April 21, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | MSC17-00286 CASE NAME: AFFINITO VS. AFFINITO HEARING IN RE: MANDATORY JUDICIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERNENCE *TENTATIVE RULING:* Appearance required. | |
March 14, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | MSC17-00286 CASE NAME: AFFINITO VS. AFFINITO HEARING ON MOTION TO CONFORM PLEADINGS TO PROOF FILED BY MARY AFFINITO, MICHELLE AFFINITO * TENTATIVE RULING: * The “Motion to Conform Pleadings To Proof,”... | |
December 13, 2021 | Tentative Ruling | MSC17-00286 CASE NAME: AFFINITO VS. AFFINITO HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR AN ORDER SETTING A SEPARATE TRIAL FILED BY MICHAEL AFFINITO * TENTATIVE RULING: * This motion is continued to March 14, 2022 to be... |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.