Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2007-1, A Delaware Statutory Tr, filed a(n) 42: Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case represented by Elliott, Carolyn S, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Fannin, Jill C presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 15, 2012 |
Category42: Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Declaration of
Date: July 14, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: July 14, 2022Proof of Service by Mail
Date: July 14, 2022Motion Filed To/For
Date: July 14, 2022Lodge Order/Judgment
Date: December 02, 2022Lodge Order/Judgment
Date: July 14, 2022Notice Filed Re:
Date: August 26, 2022Lodge Order/Judgment
Date: July 14, 2022Motion Filed To/For
Date: September 01, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: September 01, 2022Lodge Order/Judgment
Date: September 01, 2022Proof of Service by Mail
Date: September 01, 2022Lodge Order/Judgment
Date: September 01, 2022Lodge Order/Judgment
Date: December 02, 2022Declaration Re:
Date: September 01, 2022Notice of/to:
Date: July 05, 2022Notice of Hearing Re:
Date: September 14, 2022*Hearing on Motion in Re:
Date: October 19, 2022Proof of Service by Mail
Date: September 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed Notice of Entry of Judgment on 12/22/22 |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: TO VACATE DISMISSAL PUR TO CCP 664.6 |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered Before Trial | |
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notes Proposed order & judgment sent to D21 |
|
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed order to vacate dismissal Lodge Order/Judgment |
|
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed judgment Lodge Order/Judgment |
|
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minutes *Hearing on Motion in Re: To set aside CCP 664.6 dismissal and enter judgment Judge: Fannin, Jill C |
|
October 19, 2022 | Tentative Ruling | MSC12-02617 CASE NAME: NATIONAL COLLEGIATE VS. MOHAMMED KHAN HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE CCP 664.6 DISMISSAL AND ENTER JUDGMENT FILED BY: NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2007-1 *TENTATIVE RU... | |
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of hearing on Motion to set aside CCP 664.6 Dismissal and enter judgment Notice of Hearing Re: |
|
September 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by Mail of notice of hearing Proof of Service by Mail of notice of hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.