Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gemini, Leon, Gemini, Leann, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Ackroyd, Sharon, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2020 |
CategorySmall Claims $5,001 - $10,000 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Trial Continued for Service; Plaintiff's exhibits received Judge: Barrack, Malcolm |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Small Claim | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Trial
Judge: Levy, Julie |
|
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Granting Request to Postpone Small Claims Hearing | |
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Request to Postpone Small Claims Hearing | |
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.