Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Smith, Jeffery Robert, represented by Conflict Panel, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Rodney A Cortez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 01, 2021 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Completion of Wet Reckless program filed | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Enrollment in Alcohol Program filed WET RECKLESS |
|
April 24, 2023 |
Department M2 - Joshua Tree
Judge: Pallone, Christopher S |
||
April 03, 2023 |
Department M2 - Joshua Tree
Judge: Pallone, Christopher S |
||
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Failure to Comply Filed YVCC DUI PROGRAM |
|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Request To Calendar Case In-Person | |
February 01, 2023 |
Department M2 - Joshua Tree
Judge: Pallone, Christopher S |
||
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filed in Courtroom: Proof of enrollment in Wet Reckless program. |
|
January 17, 2023 |
Department M2 - Joshua Tree
Judge: Pallone, Christopher S |
||
January 06, 2023 |
Department M2 - Joshua Tree
Judge: Pallone, Christopher S |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.