Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Baligad, Donold Ruben, represented by Conflict Panel, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Rodney A Cortez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 02, 2021 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2023 |
Department M1 - Joshua Tree
Judge: Oliver, Sarah |
||
March 17, 2023 |
Department M2 - Joshua Tree
Judge: Pallone, Christopher S |
||
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | 853.6 PC Felony/Misdemeanor Cite Release Filed | |
November 04, 2022 |
Department M1 - Joshua Tree
Judge: Guerrero, Enrique |
||
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Court orders probation revoked. | |
October 18, 2022 |
Department M1 - Joshua Tree
Judge: Mathewson, Kory |
||
August 31, 2022 |
Department M1 - Joshua Tree
Judge: Guerrero, Enrique |
||
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Defendant Waived Right to Confront And Cross Examine Witness | |
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Defense Counsel Concurred in Defendants Plea or Admission | |
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Court finds defendant eligible for PC1210. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.