Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts with Cortez, Rodney A presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 26, 2021 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2022 | Hearing | PC851.8/851.91 Motion to Seal Judicial Officer Cortez, Rodney A Hearing Time 10:30 AM | |
January 21, 2022 | Hearing | Stipulation Filed | |
January 21, 2022 | Hearing | PC851.8/851.91 Motion to Seal View Document **Portal Minute Order Judicial Officer Cortez, Rodney A Hearing Time 10:30 AM Result Not Held | |
September 24, 2021 | Hearing | Petition to Seal Arrest Record under PC851.8/851.91 filed | |
June 17, 2021 | Hearing | Arraignment Judicial Officer Cortez, Rodney A Hearing Time 8:30 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment arrgn ltr | |
May 05, 2021 | Hearing | Case Ordered Dismissed Comment PER PC 1385 | |
May 03, 2021 | Hearing | Request for Dismissal received from District Attorney | |
April 30, 2021 | Hearing | Confidential Document Filed Comment DISCOVERY | |
April 26, 2021 | Hearing | eFiling - Initial Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.