Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Green, Kenneth R., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 02, 2023 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2023 | Hearing |
Motion - DCSS (Modification) 09/25/23 DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDR INTERVENE 2 MINORS CONT FROM 11/8/23 Judge: Loo, Cynthia L. |
|
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion - DCSS (Modification) 09/25/23 DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDR INTERVENE 2 MINORS CONT FROM 11/8/23 |
|
November 16, 2023 | Hearing | Request for Dismissal (Entire) | |
November 08, 2023 | Hearing |
Motion - DCSS (Modification) 09/25/23 DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDR INTERVENE 2 MINORS CONT FROM 11/8/23 Judge: Loo, Cynthia L. |
|
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion - DCSS (Modification) 09/25/23 DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDR INTERVENE 2 MINORS CONT FROM 11/8/23 |
|
November 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion - DCSS (Modification) 09/25/23 DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDR INTERVENE 2 MINORS |
|
September 25, 2023 | Hearing |
Notice of Motion - Modification (DCSS) Re: 09/25/23 DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDR INTERVENE 2 MINORS Hearing Date: 11/08/23 Hearing Time: 8:00 AM Hearing Department/Division: A |
|
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion - Modification (DCSS) Re: 09/25/23 DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDR INTERVENE 2 MINORS Hearing Date: 11/08/23 Hearing Time: 8:00 AM Hearing Department/Division: A |
|
September 12, 2023 | Hearing |
Response to Dissolution of Marriage w/ Minor Children |
|
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Response to Dissolution of Marriage w/ Minor Children |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.