Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Ceniseros, Aide G, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ceniseros, Victor M, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior with Khoury, Anthony S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 31, 2022 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: March 16, 2023Parties ordered to appear at Mediation Conference.
Date: February 17, 2023Rejection/Correction Notice
Date: February 06, 2023Mediation Appointment
Date: April 03, 2023Rejection/Correction Notice
Date: November 22, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: January 18, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Request for Order - Petitioner | |
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion - DCSS (Modification) 10/16/23 DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDR INTERVENE 3 MINORS CONT FROM 11/21/23 12/11/23 *REVIEW ONLY* |
|
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Petitioner
Judge: Green, Kenneth R., Jr. |
|
February 05, 2024 | Hearing |
Motion - DCSS (Modification) 10/16/23 DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDR INTERVENE 3 MINORS CONT FROM 11/21/23 12/11/23 *REVIEW ONLY* Judge: Loo, Cynthia L. |
|
January 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order re Modification of Child Support
Judge: Loo, Cynthia L. |
|
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion - DCSS (Modification) 10/16/23 DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDR INTERVENE 3 MINORS CONT FROM 11/21/23 *REVIEW ONLY* |
|
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Petitioner
Judge: Green, Kenneth R., Jr. |
|
December 11, 2023 | Hearing |
Motion - DCSS (Modification) 10/16/23 DCSS NOM MOD C/S H/C STND ORDR INTERVENE 3 MINORS CONT FROM 11/21/23 *REVIEW ONLY* Judge: Loo, Cynthia L. |
|
November 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Rejection/Correction Notice STIPULATION & ORDER |
|
November 22, 2023 | Hearing |
Rejection/Correction Notice STIPULATION & ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.