Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Rodgers, Deette, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Rodgers, Gary, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior with Khoury, Anthony S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2022 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 15, 2023Rejection/Correction Notice
Date: August 09, 2023Rejection/Correction Notice
Date: July 21, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 09, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2024 | Hearing | Request for Order - Respondent | |
March 04, 2024 | Hearing | Short Cause Court Trial < 5hrs | |
December 11, 2023 | Hearing |
Short Cause Court Trial < 5hrs
Judge: Green, Kenneth R., Jr. |
|
December 11, 2023 | Hearing |
Request for Order - Long Cause Hearing - Respondent
Judge: Green, Kenneth R., Jr. |
|
November 15, 2023 | Hearing |
Notice of Trial (mailed to parties) |
|
November 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Trial (mailed to parties) |
|
November 13, 2023 | Hearing |
Request for Order - Long Cause Hearing - Respondent
Judge: Webster, Jason W. |
|
November 13, 2023 | Hearing |
Short Cause Court Trial < 5hrs
Judge: Webster, Jason W. |
|
October 24, 2023 | Hearing |
Short Cause Court Trial < 5hrs
Judge: Webster, Jason W. |
|
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Confirmation of Special Setting
Judge: Webster, Jason W. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.