Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Ferguson, Ryan, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ferguson, Meca, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior Court of California with Green, Kenneth R., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 04, 2020 |
CategoryLegal Separation With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedApril 08, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: November 17, 2023Rejection/Correction Notice
Date: August 28, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 09, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: May 24, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: July 18, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: April 20, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: April 19, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 09, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 08, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 08, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: February 08, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: January 21, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: January 03, 2023Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: December 12, 2022Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: October 27, 2021Rejection/Correction Notice
Date: February 08, 2021Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: July 22, 2020Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: August 24, 2020Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: September 14, 2020Rejection/Correction Notice
Date: November 17, 2020Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: September 14, 2020Electronic Rejection Notice
Date: July 23, 2020Rejection/Correction Notice
Date: July 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Status Conference | |
March 14, 2024 | Hearing | Electronic Rejection Notice | |
March 06, 2024 | Hearing |
Stipulation and Order
Judge: Webster, Jason W. |
|
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Number Electronic Rejection Notice UNCONTESTED DEFAULT |
|
March 05, 2024 | Hearing |
Electronic Rejection Notice UNCONTESTED DEFAULT |
|
February 08, 2024 | Hearing | Notice of Hearing | |
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event | Short Cause Court Trial < 5hrs | |
January 29, 2024 | Hearing |
Confirmation of Special Setting
Judge: Green, Kenneth R., Jr. |
|
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Income and Expense Declaration w/POS |
|
January 18, 2024 | Hearing |
Income and Expense Declaration w/POS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.