Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bridewell Julia, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Bridewell Steven, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Louise E. Halevy presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 29, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions56 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time83 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Mail (- Filed and Entered on 2016-12-22 ) | |
December 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Mail (- Filed and Entered on 2016-12-22 ) | |
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
in Central Civil West Dept. - 2G, Halevy, Louise, Presiding Request for Order re: Modification Hearing - Held - Order Made Request for Order re: Modification Hearing - Held - Order Made Judge: Halevy Louise |
|
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order (- Filed and Entered on 2016-10-27 ) | |
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
at 8:00 AM in Central Civil West Dept. - 2G, Halevy, Louise, Presiding Request for Order re: Modification Hearing - Held - Order Made Judge: Louise |
|
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order (- Filed and Entered on 2016-10-27 ) | |
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Mail (Filed by Attorney for CSSD ) | |
October 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Mail (Filed by Attorney for CSSD ) | |
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.