Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Vandiver Julie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Vandiver Michael, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 29, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions482 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time542 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte - Application to Restore Former Name (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Vandiver, Julie - Signed on 2017-03-13 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte - Application to Restore Former Name (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Vandiver, Julie - Rejected on 2017-02-28 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte - Application to Restore Former Name (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Vandiver, Julie - Rejected on 2017-01-24 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Vandiver, Julie ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Vandiver, Julie - Granted on 2016-11-21 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Vandiver, Julie ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default FL170 (OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Vandiver, Julie ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Vandiver, Julie ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event | 3rd Notice Sent (Entered Date: 09-22-16 ) | |
September 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - Stipulated (sent to NOA12 on 10-28-16 - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Vandiver, Julie ) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.