Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Zamudio De Lopez Catalina, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Lopez Luis R, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 19, 2014 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions149 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time163 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Zamudio de Lopez, Catalina - Granted on 2015-01-29 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice - Entry of Judgment (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Zamudio de Lopez, Catalina ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Default FL170 (Or Uncontested Dissolution - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Zamudio de Lopez, Catalina ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (sent to NOA12 on 01/29/15 - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Zamudio de Lopez, Catalina ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Zamudio de Lopez, Catalina ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Final Dec. of Disclosure (Incomplete - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Zamudio de Lopez, Catalina ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
January 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Zamudio de Lopez, Catalina ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request - Enter Default FL165 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Zamudio de Lopez, Catalina ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
November 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Milestone 2 Completed (Entered Date: 12-11-14 ) | |
November 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Zamudio de Lopez, Catalina ) Filed by Petitioner |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.