Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Moore Robin C., Moore Robin C, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Moore Jeffrey A., Moore Jeffrey A, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Randolph Rogers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRandolph Rogers Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2022 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children (General Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Set Security Group to Not Allow E-Filing | |
August 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order - Findings and Order After Hearing (amended - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Moore, Robin - Signed on 2008-08-20 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
August 20, 2008 | Hearing |
Order - Findings and Order After Hearing (amended - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Moore, Robin - Signed on 2008-08-20 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order - Findings and Order After Hearing (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Moore, Robin - Signed on 2008-07-14 ) Filed by Petitioner Filed by Petitioner |
|
July 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order - Findings and Order After Hearing (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Moore, Robin - Signed on 2008-07-14 ) Filed by Petitioner |
|
June 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Michael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Dept. - A13, Rogers, Randolph A., Presiding Hearing - Held - Order Made Hearing - Held - Order Made Judge: Rogers Randolph A. |
|
June 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 18, 2008 | Hearing |
at 8:30 AM in Michael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Dept. - A13, Rogers, Randolph A., Presiding Hearing - Held - Order Made Judge: Randolph A. |
|
March 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Michael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Dept. - A13, Rogers, Randolph A., Presiding Conference - Held - Continued Conference - Held - Continued Judge: Rogers Randolph A. |
|
March 19, 2008 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.