Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Crown Asset Management, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Weingarten, Martin Ryan, against Arnold, Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Sonoma County. This case was filed in Sonoma County Superior Courts with Dollard, Jennifer V presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDollard, Jennifer V Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2019 |
Category09: Limited Rule 3.740 Collections - 0 To 10,000 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSonoma County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Trial Setting Judge: Dollard, Jennifer V |
|
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference - Collections
Judge: Wick, Arthur A |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Filed Document Answer to complaint |
|
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Granting Application for Waiver of Court Fees & Costs | |
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer | |
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Application For Waiver Of Court Fees & Costs | |
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Process personal |
|
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment to 1 Judge and Notice of CMC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.