Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Anthony, Michael Tolliver, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Luttuschka Bourque, Corey James, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Lisa M. Pacione presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
Category43-Ch Civil Harassment - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2021 | Hearing | Audio streaming announced. | |
September 23, 2021 | Hearing |
Civil Harassment Restraining Order After Hearing (CH-130)
Judge: Pacione, Lisa M. |
|
September 23, 2021 | Hearing |
Petition for Harassment
Judge: Pacione, Lisa M., Pacione, Lisa M. |
|
September 16, 2021 | Hearing |
Petition for Harassment
Judge: Pacione, Lisa M. |
|
September 02, 2021 | Hearing | Order on Request to Continue Hearing (CH-116) | |
September 02, 2021 | Hearing | Proof of Personal Service (CH-200) | |
September 01, 2021 | Hearing | Request to Continue Court Hearing (CH-115) | |
September 01, 2021 | Hearing |
Notice of Court Hearing (CH-109)
Judge: Pacione, Lisa M. |
|
September 01, 2021 | Hearing |
Temporary Restraining Order (CH-110)
Judge: Pacione, Lisa M. |
|
August 31, 2021 | Hearing | Civil and Small Claims Documents |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.