Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Khoury, Anthony S. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 04, 2022 |
Category09-Cl >10K <25K Rule 3.740 Collections |
Last RefreshedJanuary 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2024 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)
Judge: Webster, Jason W. |
|
October 19, 2023 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f)
Judge: Webster, Jason W. |
|
April 13, 2023 | Hearing |
Notice of OSC re 3.740(d) (N21) Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) Judge: Green, Kenneth R., Jr. |
|
October 11, 2022 | Hearing |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint FOR ERNEST L HARDIN JR |
|
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint FOR ERNEST L HARDIN JR |
|
October 10, 2022 | Hearing | Summons Issued and Filed | |
October 04, 2022 | Hearing | Statement of Classification and Location | |
October 04, 2022 | Hearing | Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) | |
October 04, 2022 | Hearing | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.