Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hotan Anvari, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Jalilvand Law Corporation, against Andrea Alice Jansen, represented by Law Offices Of Darlene Rohr, in the jurisdiction of Riverside County. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts with Gloria Connor Trask presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2013 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Auto |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRiverside County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Cycle Time1119 days |
Request for Dismissal WITH prejudice Entire Action filed
Date: 2016-01-04T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Mandatory Settlement Conference (Noticed)
Date: 2015-10-23T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing.
Date: 2015-07-16T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Ex Parte Hearing re TO CONTINUE TRIAL.
Date: 2015-11-16T00:00:00Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO SET ASIDE by ANDREA ALICE JANSEN filed
Date: 2015-07-21T00:00:00Proposed Order re: EX PARTE for hearing on 11/16/15 submitted by HOTAN ANVARI.
Date: 2015-11-13T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: OSC HEARING RE: DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE.
Date: 2015-11-19T00:00:00Ex Parte Application to/for CONTINUE TRIAL OR SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR MTN by HOTAN ANVARI filed
Date: 2015-11-13T00:00:00Notice OF LIEN by HOTAN ANVARI filed.
Date: 2015-11-16T00:00:00System Generated Notice re: Mandatory Settlement Conference.
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Order filed by HOTAN ANVARI.
Date: 2015-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Settlement of Entire Case filed - Unconditional Settlement CRC 3.1385 [Form CM 200].
Date: 2015-11-19T00:00:00Notice of posting jury fees by ANDREA ALICE JANSEN.
Date: 2014-02-13T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Jury Trial
Date: 2015-02-20T00:00:00Notice of Settlement of Entire Case filed - Conditional Settlement CRC 3.1385 (05B*RMCCON) Form CM-200.
Date: 2015-01-21T00:00:00Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92591.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement by ANDREA ALICE JANSEN filed Untimely Pursuant to CRC 3.725.
Date: 2014-06-26T00:00:00Complaint Filed Fast Track - Summons Issued.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference
Date: 2014-10-23T00:00:00Legacy Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing
Date: 2014-06-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed by HOTAN ANVARI
Date: 2014-06-05T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HOTAN ANVARI
Date: 2014-06-05T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY ANDREA ALICE JANSEN FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.
Date: 2014-06-26T00:00:00NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF DEPARTMENT TO DEPARTMENT 03.
Date: 2014-05-28T00:00:00JURY FEE DEPOSIT OF $150.00 PAID BY ANDREA ALICE JANSEN.
Date: 2014-02-13T00:00:00CASE IS REASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE JUDGE SUNSHINE S SYKES IN DEPT. 06 FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES.
Date: 2014-01-14T00:00:00SUMMONS FILED.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 11 FOR LAW AND MOTION PURPOSES.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY ANDREA ALICE JANSEN.
Date: 2014-02-13T00:00:00DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 06. (RIVERSIDE)
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92591.
Date: 2013-12-31T00:00:00REC'D & FORWD MSC BRIEF BY ANDREA ALICE JANSEN TO DEPT. 02
Date: 2015-09-15T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED
Date: 2016-01-04T00:00:00MOTION HEARING RESERVATION RE: MOTION SET FOR 07/30/15 AT 08:30 IS CONFIRMED.
Date: 2015-06-25T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR CONTINUE TRIAL OR SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR MTN BY HOTAN ANVARI FILED
Date: 2015-11-13T00:00:00HEARING SET 7/30/15 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT 01
Date: 2015-06-25T00:00:00ON-LINE MOTION RESERVED ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF.
Date: 2015-06-23T00:00:00COURT REPORTER FEE (UNDER ONE HOUR) PAID BY PLAINTIFF FOR HEARING 07/30/15.
Date: 2015-06-24T00:00:00RETURNED DOCUMENT: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ENTIRE ACTION W/PREJUDICE SUBMITTED BY HOTAN ANVARI.
Date: 2016-02-04T00:00:00SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING.
Date: 2015-07-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF LIEN BY HOTAN ANVARI FILED.
Date: 2015-11-16T00:00:00FAX FILING BY HOTAN ANVARI ($1.50 PER PAGE).
Date: 2015-11-03T00:00:00NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED - CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT CRC 3.1385 (05B*RMCCOND) FORM CM-200.
Date: 2015-01-21T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER FEE PAID BY HOTAN ANVARI
Date: 2015-11-03T00:00:00EX PARTE HEARING SET ON 11/16/15 AT 8:30 IN DEPT 01
Date: 2015-11-13T00:00:00SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OSC HEARING RE: DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE.
Date: 2015-11-19T00:00:00HEARING RESERVED SET 07/30/15 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 01 - RES46345
Date: 2015-06-23T00:00:00RETURNED DOCUMENT: STIP/ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE SUBMITTED BY HOTAN ANVARI.
Date: 2015-10-30T00:00:00COURT REPORTER FEE (UNDER ONE HOUR) PAID BY HOTAN ANVARI FOR HEARING 11/16/15.
Date: 2015-11-13T00:00:00RE-ASSIGN DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO 01
Date: 2014-12-05T00:00:00MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET 10/23/15 AT 14:00 IN 02
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00FAX FILING BY HOTAN ANVARI ($1.50 PER PAGE).
Date: 2015-11-13T00:00:00OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO SET ASIDE BY ANDREA ALICE JANSEN FILED
Date: 2015-07-21T00:00:00NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED - UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT CRC 3.1385 [FORM CM 200].
Date: 2015-11-19T00:00:00FAX FILING BY HOTAN ANVARI ($1.50 PER PAGE).
Date: 2016-01-04T00:00:00SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE.
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00FAX FILING BY HOTAN ANVARI ($1.50 PER PAGE).
Date: 2015-11-19T00:00:00FAX FILING BY HOTAN ANVARI ($1.50 PER PAGE).
Date: 2015-10-30T00:00:00NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER FILED BY HOTAN ANVARI.
Date: 2015-08-10T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2020 | Hearing |
Jury Trial Vacated |
|
November 16, 2020 | Hearing |
Ex Parte Hearing re TO CONTINUE TRIAL. Denied |
|
October 23, 2020 | Hearing |
Mandatory Settlement Conference (Noticed) Complete |
|
October 23, 2020 | Hearing |
Trial Setting Conference Complete |
|
August 07, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing re: Motion to/for SET ASIDE AND VACATE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND TO PLACE MATTER BACK ON CALENDAR by HOTAN ANVARI Granted |
|
July 30, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing re: Motion to/for SET ASIDE AND VACATE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND TO PLACE MATTER BACK ON CALENDAR by HOTAN ANVARI Continued - Not Held |
|
July 30, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing Reserved for: Motion to Set Aside and Vacate Notice of Settlement - RES46345 Reserved |
|
June 30, 2020 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference Hearing Trial Setting Conference Set |
|
February 20, 2020 | Hearing |
Jury Trial Vacated |
|
February 20, 2020 | Hearing |
Jury Trial Continued - Not Held |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.