Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Doe N.B. filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Greer Kathryn Lorene, Manly John Clinton, against Antelope Valley Schools Transportation Agency, Antelope Valley Union High School District, represented by Aarvig Maria K, Oppenheim Richard David Jr, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Michael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse with Randolph A. Rogers presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions372 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseMichael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: May 08, 2019STANDING ORDER RE PERSONAL INJURY COURT PROCEDURES
Date: February 08, 2018COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -
Date: June 06, 2018CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET
Date: June 06, 2018DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: June 06, 2018NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT- UNLIMITED CIVIL
Date: June 06, 2018NOTICE OF REJECTION
Date: June 20, 2018DECLARATION - ISO PETITION FOR GUARDIAN AD LITEM
Date: June 22, 2018SUMMONS -
Date: June 22, 2018APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM
Date: June 22, 2018AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: September 17, 2018Proof of Personal Service
Date: November 29, 2018ANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH -
Date: September 18, 2018Notice of Appearance
Date: December 18, 2018Answer
Date: December 18, 2018Demand for Jury Trial
Date: December 18, 2018Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: December 18, 2018Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: May 08, 2019Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: June 06, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS)
Date: June 13, 2019Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing
Date: June 14, 2019Motion for Order - COURT'S ORDER AFTER HEARING
Date: June 17, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: June 17, 2019Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: August 01, 2019Statement of Decision
Date: June 17, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 09, 2019Association of Attorney
Date: September 06, 2019Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: September 09, 2019Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES
Date: September 26, 2019Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT OF SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AND RESPONSES IN DISPUTE
Date: September 26, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF SENIOR LITIGATION PARALEGAL MICHAEL MURRELL
Date: October 10, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION OF JEFFREY C. LYNN
Date: October 10, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES
Date: October 18, 2019Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: October 31, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: November 08, 2019Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: November 08, 2019Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT OF SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AND RESPONSES IN DISPUTE
Date: November 12, 2019Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES
Date: November 12, 2019Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE AND TRIAL
Date: November 21, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: December 17, 2019Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing
Date: December 17, 2019Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: December 17, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT ANTELOPE VALLEY SCHOOLS...)
Date: December 17, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL FROM APRIL 6, 2020 THROUGH APRIL 17, 2020
Date: February 18, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: ADVANCEMENT)
Date: April 17, 2020Notice of Settlement
Date: March 20, 2020Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim
Date: April 30, 2020Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing
Date: May 20, 2020Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim
Date: May 28, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE)
Date: June 22, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE)
Date: September 17, 2020Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 22, 2020Notice of Hearing on Petition - NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE
Date: September 22, 2020Order - ORDER AMENDED TO ORDER APPROVING MINORS COMPROMISE
Date: October 14, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE)
Date: October 14, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND ORDER
Date: October 16, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: January 04, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT
Date: January 06, 2021Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: January 26, 2021Notice of Case Assignment
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-06-20T00:00:00Petn & Ord Appointing GAL
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2018-09-17T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Summons Issued
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2018-12-18T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Trial, FSC and Related Motion/Discovery Dates)
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2018-12-18T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (in Support of Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2018-12-18T00:00:00Reply (to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings))
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Statement of Decision
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Notice (of Reassignment)
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Separate Statement (of Special Interrogatories and Responses in Dispute)
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2019-08-01T00:00:00Court's Order After Hearing
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Separate Statement (or Requests for Production of Documents and Responses in Dispute)
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Separate Statement (of Special Interrogatories and Responses in Dispute)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Other - (Opposing Separate Statement of Requests for Production of Documents and Responses in Dispute)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Notice of Settlement ((Minor Plaintiff))
Date: 2020-03-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Defendant Antelope Valley Union H...))
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Production Set One)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Jeffrey C. Lynn)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing])
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Advancement))
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Opposition ( to Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Notice (of Unavailability of Counsel from April 6, 2020 through April 17, 2020)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Final Status Conference and Trial)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Separate Statement (of Requests for Production of Documents and Responses in Dispute)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for Production of Documents)
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatories)
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (For Mental Examination of Plaintiff, J.O. DOE; Order Thereon)
Date: 2020-02-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Senior Litigation Paralegal Michael Murrell)
Date: 2019-10-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Advancement) of 04/17/2020)
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Defendant Antelope Valley Schools...))
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise))
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Advance the Hearing Date o...))
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing])
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Declaration (of Will Lindahl in Support of Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action: Exhibit 1)
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Petition to Confirm Minor's Compromise))
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Petition (to Confirm Minor's Compromise)
Date: 2020-09-22T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.