Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bank Of America N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Layman Patrick James, against Singh Lovely P., represented by Jacobs Lynda E., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Michael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse with Randolph A. Rogers presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions110 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseMichael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Conditional Settlement) |
Case Cycle Time544 days |
Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Document:Motion for an Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Document:Notice of Case Assignment Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Document:Request for Entry of Default Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Document:Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Final Status Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Document:Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Document:Complaint filed-Summons Issued Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: November 22, 2017Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail -
Date: April 26, 2018MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND SUPPORTING DOCS
Date: April 26, 2018COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES
Date: September 22, 2017ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: January 10, 2018Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Final Status Conference) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Lovely P. Singh (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Judgment Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Answer Filed by Lovely P. Singh (Defendant)
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-05 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Plaintiff's Failure to ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Summons Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Motion for an Order Filed by Lovely P. Singh (Defendant)
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Complaint filed-Summons Issued Filed by null PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2018-01-05T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Complaint filed-Summons Issued
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-09-22T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2017-11-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2018-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference))
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Final Status Conference) of 10/31/2018)
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal With Prejudice Pending Cons...))
Date: March 20, 2019Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Plaintiff's Failure to ...))
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.