Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hernandez Eusebia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Azizzadeh Shawn, against Ambassador Cars, Dixon Spencer, Ray Givonna, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Michael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse with Randolph A. Rogers presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management803 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions530 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseMichael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time924 days |
Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: November 09, 2018Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal
Date: July 03, 2019Complaint -
Date: September 20, 2017Answer
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Complaint filed-Summons Issued
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Appear and P...))
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of all Unserved Defendants))
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: April 01, 2020Court's Order After Hearing
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: March 02, 2020Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: November 27, 2019Minute Order ((Final Status Conference))
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2017-09-20T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Appear and P...))
Date: 2019-06-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: December 02, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: November 27, 2019Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473)))
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (re Case Resassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice)
Date: 2019-08-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.