Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bakluk Laith, Bakluk Walid, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Goldsman Gene J, against Farmers, Farmers Financial Solutions Llc., Farmers Insurance Exchange, Guzman Blanca Aka B. Lidia, Kraft Lake Insurance Agency Inc., (total of 5) See All represented by Arnold Larry M., Price Kevin J, Scher Gregory B., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Michael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse with Brian C. Yep presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management266 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2016 |
CategoryOther Non-Personal Injury/Property Damage Tort (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseMichael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time413 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: October 24, 2016PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: October 26, 2016COMPLAINT-CONTRACT -
Date: September 28, 2016DECLARATION - IN SUPPORT IF DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT
Date: November 30, 2016DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES
Date: November 30, 2016REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT
Date: November 30, 2016DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: February 10, 2017DECLARATION - IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: February 10, 2017ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: February 27, 2017PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: February 22, 2017NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OF DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: February 27, 2017DEFENDANTS REPLY TO OPPOSTION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: February 27, 2017ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: April 14, 2017SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: April 27, 2017DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: May 15, 2017Demurrer
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00Complaint filed-Summons Issued
Date: 2016-09-28T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2016-10-26T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-11-30T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2016-10-24T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2016-09-28T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment
Date: 2016-09-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-01-06T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-04-05T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-01-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-02-10T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-04-18T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-02-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-03-27T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2017-02-10T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-02-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-03-09T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-02-27T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2017-03-14T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2017-03-21T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2017-03-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-03-10T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-04-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-05-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: June 12, 2017Request for Dismissal
Date: November 15, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: June 07, 2017Answer to Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-05-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.