Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ramos Rosamelia, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Usher Ulric E. J. Esq., against Ramos Richard, represented by Campbell Nick M., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Michael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse with Randolph A. Rogers presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management119 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions51 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseMichael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time778 days |
Proof of Service by 1st Class Mail -
Date: April 05, 2017MOTION FOR ORDER DEEMING ADMITTED TRUTH OF FACTS
Date: January 18, 2018MOTION FOR ORDER
Date: February 01, 2018Summons
Date: 2016-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-02-24T00:00:00Complaint filed-Summons Issued
Date: 2016-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment
Date: 2016-02-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-06-15T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2016-03-15T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2016-04-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-04-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2016-06-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Statement of Decision
Date: February 15, 2018Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-06-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-06-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: February 20, 2018Request for Dismissal
Date: April 12, 2018Order
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.