Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Coffee House Industries Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Woodard Events Llc, Woodard Joe, represented by Case John A, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Michael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse with Brian C. Yep presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian C. Yep Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management562 days |
Filing DateNovember 09, 2015 |
CategoryContract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (No Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseMichael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time666 days |
MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY BASED ON FORUM NON CONVENIENS
Date: September 01, 2016DEFENDANT'S REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: September 29, 2016Summons on Cross Complaint -
Date: October 31, 2016CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: October 31, 2016ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: October 31, 2016ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT
Date: January 06, 2017FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: February 21, 2017DEMURRER TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES IN FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: March 27, 2017Summons
Date: 2015-11-09T00:00:00Complaint filed-Summons Issued
Date: 2015-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2015-11-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment
Date: 2015-11-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2015-12-21T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2015-12-21T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2015-11-25T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2015-12-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-02-25T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-03-14T00:00:00Summons Issued
Date: 2016-03-14T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-03-14T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2016-03-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-05-20T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2016-05-23T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-04-18T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2016-04-18T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2016-04-18T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2016-05-31T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-06-27T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-06-27T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-08-01T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-06-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-06-09T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2016-08-24T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-08-09T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2016-09-01T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-09-01T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-09-01T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2016-09-29T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2016-09-22T00:00:00Cross-Compl fld - Summons Issued
Date: 2016-10-31T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2016-10-31T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-10-31T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2017-01-06T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-03-03T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-01-19T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-04-17T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-02-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2017-04-17T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2017-03-27T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-03-27T00:00:00Notice
Date: August 09, 2017Notice
Date: 2017-05-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: September 05, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.