Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Escoe Renisha L., Escoe Tyana L., Jacobs Rodney T., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Anderson Mark A., against Mayo Cheryl, Mayo Nicholas E., represented by Ramsey Christopher Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Michael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse with Randolph A. Rogers presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management123 days |
|
Filing DateMay 14, 2015 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseMichael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time719 days |
MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5
Date: October 17, 2016MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4
Date: October 17, 2016MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3
Date: October 17, 2016MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2
Date: October 17, 2016MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1
Date: October 17, 2016PROPOSED ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONINTUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES]
Date: November 02, 2016Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2015-05-14T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2015-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-05-14T00:00:00Answer Filed by NICHOLAS E. MAYO (Defendant)
Date: 2015-07-27T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2016-11-02T00:00:00Document:Demand for Jury Trial Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2015-07-27T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2015-07-27T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2015-08-31T00:00:00Complaint filed-Summons Issued Filed by null PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2015-05-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-05-14T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by NICHOLAS E. MAYO (Defendant)
Date: 2015-07-27T00:00:00Summons Filed by TYANA L. ESCOE (Plaintiff); RENISHA L. ESCOE (Plaintiff); RODNEY T. JACOBS (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-05-14T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by NICHOLAS E. MAYO (Defendant)
Date: 2015-08-31T00:00:00Motion-In Limine Filed by NICHOLAS E. MAYO (Defendant)
Date: 2016-10-17T00:00:00Document:Complaint filed-Summons Issued Filed by: N/A
Date: 2015-05-14T00:00:00Document:Motion-In Limine Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2016-10-17T00:00:00Document:Request for Entry of Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: May 02, 2017Document:Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2015-07-06T00:00:00Document:Notice-Settlement Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2016-08-10T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant
Date: 2015-07-27T00:00:00Document:Notice of Case Assignment Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2015-05-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by NICHOLAS E. MAYO (Defendant)
Date: 2015-07-27T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff
Date: 2015-05-14T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2015-07-06T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2015-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment
Date: 2015-05-14T00:00:00Complaint filed-Summons Issued
Date: 2015-05-14T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2015-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2015-05-14T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2015-05-14T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2015-07-27T00:00:00Motion-In Limine
Date: 2016-10-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-07-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-09-11T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2016-08-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: May 02, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.