Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Trevino Armando A Minor, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kistler Paul M., against Cowart Jeffrey, Antelope Valley Union High School, represented by Oppenheim Jr. Richard D. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Michael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse with BRIAN C. YEP presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBRIAN C. YEP Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 18, 2009 |
CategoryUninsured Motorist (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseMichael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time174 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Paper file destroyed Filed by Court |
|
August 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department ATV10, BRIAN C. YEP, Presiding Hearing on Demurrer (1) DEM OF DEFT ANTELOPE VALLEY TOCOMPLAINT 2) MTN OF DEFT TO STRIKEPORTIONS OF COMPLAINT 3) CASEMANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ** DISMISSAL FILED **) - Advanced to this date & Vacated Judge: BRIAN C. YEP |
|
August 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice (THAT HEARINGS ON DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE ARE OFF CALENDAR ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
August 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Dismissal (ENTIRE ACTION W/ PREJ ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department ATV10, BRIAN C. YEP, Presiding Conference-Case Management - Matter heard, matter continued Judge: BRIAN C. YEP |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion to Strike (PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT; MEMO OF P&A'S IN SUPPORT THEREOF (HEARING 8/20/09)) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing on Demurrer (& DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; MEMO OF P&A'S IN SUPPORT THEREOF (HEARING 8/20/09)) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (REQUEST OF THD COURT TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE; MEMO OF P&A'S SUPPORT THEREOF; DECL OF YVONNE HEITZ ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.