Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
DAVID G. BROWN VS K.B. BROWN CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
On December 05, 2006 a motor vehicle - pi/pd/wd (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge RANDOLPH ROGERS presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 05, 2006
Last Refreshed
February 19, 2021
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Michael D. Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse
Category
Motor Vehicle - PI/PD/WD (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Case Outcome Type
Dismissed - Other
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
3 years and 3 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
Paper file destroyed Filed by Court |
|
June 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (NTBS (2) ISSUED TO TRANSFER UNUSED JURY FEES. ) Filed by Clerk |
|
March 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department ATV11, RANDOLPH ROGERS, Presiding Order to Show Cause (RE: DISMISSAL PENDING CONSUM-MATION OF SETTLEMENTO/C DISMISSAL FILED) - Advanced to this date & Vacated Judge: RANDOLPH ROGERS |
|
January 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order (ORDER FOR K.B. BROWN CONST. FOR REFUND OF JURY FEES SIGNED BY JUDGE ROGERS. ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
January 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
in Department ADR, ADR Neutral, Presiding Closed-ADR - Not Held-Removed ADR-Dismissed Judge: ADR Neutral |
|
December 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department ATV11, RANDOLPH ROGERS, Presiding Jury Trial - Advanced to this date & Vacated Judge: RANDOLPH ROGERS |
|
December 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Dismissal (W/OUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
November 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice (OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
September 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department ATV11, RANDOLPH ROGERS, Presiding Jury Trial - Advanced to this date & continued Judge: RANDOLPH ROGERS |
|
September 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
September 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
September 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (WITNESS LIST ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
September 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (PROPOSED Jury Instructions ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
September 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (EXHIBIT LIST ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
September 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (STATEMENT OF THE CASE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
September 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department ATV11, RANDOLPH ROGERS, Presiding Final Status Conference (2. POST MEDIATION STATUS CONF.C/F 8/17/09JURY TRIAL 9/11/2009) - Matter continued Judge: RANDOLPH ROGERS |
|
August 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department ATV11, RANDOLPH ROGERS, Presiding Post Mediation Status Conference (**CONT TO 09/02/09 8:30AM A11DEFT TO GIVE NOTICE**FSC - 9/2/2009JURY TRIAL - 9/11/2009) - Matter continued Judge: RANDOLPH ROGERS |
|
August 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
August 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice (jury fees ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
August 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice (posting jury fees ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice-Assignment-Mediator Filed by ADR Clerk |
|
June 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department ATV11, RANDOLPH ROGERS, Presiding Post Mediation Status Conference (MEDIATION COMPLETION EXTENDED TO5-26-09) - Matter continued Judge: RANDOLPH ROGERS |
|
April 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Lien Filed by Attorney for Lien Claimant |
|
April 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Lien Filed by Attorney for Lien Claimant |
|
February 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department ATV16, Randy Rhodes, Presiding Jury Trial - Advanced to this date & continued Judge: RANDY RHODES |
|
February 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department ATV16, Randy Rhodes, Presiding Final Status Conference (J.T. 2/27/09) - Advanced to this date & continued Judge: RANDY RHODES |
|
January 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
in Department ATV16, RANDOLPH ROGERS, Presiding Case Ordered Reassigned - Case is reassigned Judge: RANDOLPH ROGERS |
|
December 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice (OF CASE REASSIGNMENT. ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
December 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department ATV16, Randy Rhodes, Presiding Post Mediation Status Conference (MEDIATION COMPLETION EXTENDED TO11-17-08) - Advanced to this date & continued Judge: RANDY RHODES |
|
December 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by Clerk |
|
December 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Ex-Parte Application (TO CONTIMUE TRIAL ETC ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
December 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
December 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department ATV16, Randy Rhodes, Presiding Exparte proceeding (TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND OTHERDATES) - Motion Granted Judge: RANDY RHODES |
|
December 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order (CONTINUING TRIAL AND OTHER DATES JUDGE Randy Rhodes ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
September 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
September 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department ATV17, Randy Rhodes, Presiding Post Mediation Status Conference (*con't to 12-15-08, plft ntc*(STIP COMING IN)MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE 8/18/08) - Matter continued Judge: RANDY RHODES |
|
September 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
Stipulation (TO CONTINUE THE MEDIATION COMPLE- TION DATE AND POST MEDIAITON STATUS CONFERENCE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment & Ord Filed by Clerk |
|
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Ntc of Change of Firm Name & Addr (NICHOLAS C. ROWLEY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
March 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department ATV17, CARLOS P\. BAKER, JR\., Presiding Conference-Case Management - Status Conference Held Judge: JR. |
|
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department ATV17, CARLOS P\. BAKER, JR\., Presiding Conference-Case Management - Continued by Stipulation Judge: JR. |
|
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
December 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Association of Attorneys (ALEJANDRO BLANCO IS ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
November 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney (NICHOLAS C. ROWLEY SUBS IN AS ATTY FOR PLNTF. DAVID BROWN ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
November 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department ATV17, CARLOS P\. BAKER, JR\., Presiding Conference-Case Management - Continued by Defendant Judge: JR. |
|
October 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice (OF IMMEDIATE UNAVAILABILITY AND ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
September 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
August 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department ATV17, CARLOS P\. BAKER, JR\., Presiding OSC-Failure to Appear (AT CMC) - OSC Discharged Judge: JR. |
|
August 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney (JOHN DOHERTY SUBS IN FOR ATTY OF RECORD FOR DEFT RALINDA WAGE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
July 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
July 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department ATV17, Floyd V\. Baxter, Presiding Conference-Case Management (CF 4/16/07) - Off Calendar Judge: FLOYD V. BAXTER |
|
July 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Association of Attorney (DOHERTY & CATLOW ARE ASSOCIATED HEREIN ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
July 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Association of Attorney (WESIERSKI & ZUERK, LLP IS ASSOCIATED HEREIN ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
June 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney (DAVID G. BROWN SUBS IN PRO PER ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
June 22, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Lien (FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department ATV17, FRANK Y\. JACKSON, Presiding Conference-Case Management - Continued Judge: FRANK Y. JACKSON |
|
April 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
March 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Statement-Case Management Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
March 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Association of Attorney (LAW OFFICES OF ROWLEY & LARRIMORE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
March 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint (K.B. BROWN CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC. AND RALINDA LEE WAGE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant |
|
February 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SERVED K.B. BROWN CONSTRUCTION COMPANY ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
January 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl (SERVED RALINDA LEE WAGE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice (OF ASSIGNMENT ) Filed by Clerk |
|
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice-Case Management Conference (4-16-07 8:30AM DEPT. A17 ) Filed by Clerk |
|
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed | |
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |