Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Young Georgia, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case against Woman Lynwood Correctional Facitity For, Woman Lynwood Correctional Facility For, Watch Commanders Vaughn, Watch Commanders Martinez, Watch Commander Brandon, (total of 39) See All represented by Office Of Legislative Counsel, Mccaverty Jonathan, Fortner Jr. Raymond G., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Chatsworth Courthouse with Floyd V. Baxter presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management262 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2006 |
CategoryCivil Rights/Discrimination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions267 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseChatsworth Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time707 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Ord of Disml with prejudice Filed by Court |
|
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department F49 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Case Dismissed) - |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by TWIN TOWERS JAIL (Defendant); M ANTONOVICH (Defendant) |
|
January 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
in Department F49 (Order to Show Cause; Continued by Court) - |
|
December 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Ord of Disml with prejudice Filed by PUBLIC DEFENDER GUSTAVO DIAZ (Defendant) |
|
November 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by TWIN TOWERS JAIL (Defendant); M ANTONOVICH (Defendant) |
|
November 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by CALIF. ST. ASSEMBLY MEMBER SHARON RUNNER (Defendant) |
|
November 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department F49 Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (Hearing on Demurrer; Demurrer sustained without leave) - |
|
November 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
in Department F49 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter is continued) - |
|
November 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.