Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Rocco, Anthony, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Rocco, Rebecca, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Green, Kenneth R., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 06, 2014 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage Without Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1545 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time2048 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2019 | Hearing | Proof of Service by Mail | |
August 15, 2019 | Hearing |
Findings and Orders
Judge: Green, Kenneth R., Jr. |
|
June 17, 2019 | Hearing |
Mediation Agreement and Order
Judge: Green, Kenneth R., Jr. |
|
June 17, 2019 | Hearing | Mediation Appointment | |
June 17, 2019 | Hearing |
Request for Order - Petitioner
Judge: Green, Kenneth R., Jr. |
|
June 14, 2019 | Hearing | Proof of Service by Mail | |
June 07, 2019 | Hearing | Rejection/Correction Notice | |
May 07, 2019 | Hearing | Request for Order with Court Order (FL-300) | |
April 03, 2019 | Hearing |
Ex Parte Application and Order to Restore Name
Judge: Green, Kenneth R., Jr. |
|
April 03, 2019 | Hearing | Confidential Document |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.