Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lima, Aracely, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Jimmerson, Paris, Jimmerson, Shonbae Hill, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Woodward, Cory J. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 31, 2011 |
Category32-Cl <10K Unlawful Detainer - Residential - Civil Limited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions29 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time1268 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2015 | Hearing | Case Destroyed Pursuant to Government Code Section | |
May 17, 2012 | Hearing |
NP4170 Department: BM Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE DISMISSAL THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY EITHER PARTY PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FOR MONETARY DAMAGES IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. HEARING AFTER TRIAL. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
May 17, 2012 | Hearing |
4003 Order to Show Cause Hearing Entered. |
|
May 17, 2012 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause
Judge: Woodward, Cory J. |
|
May 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
NP4170 Department: BM Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE DISMISSAL THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY EITHER PARTY PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FOR MONETARY DAMAGES IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. HEARING AFTER TRIAL. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
May 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
4003 Order to Show Cause Hearing Entered. |
|
January 24, 2012 | Hearing | Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied | |
December 15, 2011 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause
Judge: Woodward, Cory J. |
|
November 30, 2011 | Hearing |
115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 Amount of $25.00 for LIMA, ARACELY (PL-1). Received from COUNTER. Receipt #625372 for amount of $25.00. |
|
November 30, 2011 | Hearing | Writ of Possession Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.