Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Rausch, Lynn, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Retes, Nancy, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Woodward, Cory J. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 29, 2011 |
Category32-Cl <10K Unlawful Detainer - Residential - Civil Limited |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions12 days |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time1433 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2015 | Hearing | Case Destroyed Pursuant to Government Code Section | |
November 17, 2011 | Hearing |
NP4170 Department: BM Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE DISMISSAL THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY OR ON BEHALF OF EITHER PARTY. PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FOR MONETARY DAMAGES IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. HEARING AFTER TRIAL. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
November 17, 2011 | Hearing |
4003 Order to Show Cause Hearing Entered. |
|
November 17, 2011 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause
Judge: Woodward, Cory J. |
|
November 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
NP4170 Department: BM Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE DISMISSAL THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: NO APPEARANCE BY OR ON BEHALF OF EITHER PARTY. PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FOR MONETARY DAMAGES IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. HEARING AFTER TRIAL. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
November 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
4003 Order to Show Cause Hearing Entered. |
|
June 16, 2011 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause
Judge: Woodward, Cory J. |
|
June 13, 2011 | Hearing | Writ of Possession Returned Unsatisfied | |
May 11, 2011 | Hearing |
115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 Amount of $25.00 for RAUSCH, LYNN (PL-1). Received from MICHELE SLADE. Receipt #589102 for amount of $25.00. |
|
May 11, 2011 | Hearing |
Order to Show Cause NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED TO: Plaintiff herein and Plaintiff's attorney of record, if any: You, and each of you, are ordered to appear before the court on 11/17/2011 at 1:30 PM in Department BM, 1773 HIGHWAY 58, MOJAVE, CA 93501, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed, or other sanctions imposed for your failure to comply with the Special Rules for Administration of Civil Litigation and more specifically: PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES OF COURT 3.17.8(B) WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ [~PERSON:CALJUDGENAME] Judge of the Superior Court Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED TO: Plaintiff herein and Plaintiff's attorney of record, if any: You, and each of you, are ordered to appear before the court on 11/17/2011 at 1:30 PM in Department BM, 1773 HIGHWAY 58, MOJAVE, CA 93501, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed, or other sanctions imposed for your failure to comply with the Special Rules for Administration of Civil Litigation and more specifically: PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULES OF COURT 3.17.8(B) WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ CORY J WOODWARD Judge of the Superior Court |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.