Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Proud American Investments, Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Kelly, Michael Joel, against Taylor, Alvis, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts with Woodward, Cory J. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management25 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2005 |
Category32-Cl >10K <25K Unlawful Detainer - Residential-Civil Limit |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time60 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2006 | Hearing |
4153 Case Management Conference New Calendar |
|
February 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
4153 Case Management Conference New Calendar |
|
February 27, 2006 | Hearing |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
February 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal (Entire) WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION. DULY FILED AND ENTERED. |
|
January 24, 2006 | Hearing |
NP1430 Department: AM Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: JERRY VOSEN MAKES A SPECIAL APPEARANCE FOR MICHAEL JOEL KELLY ON BEHALF OF PROUD AMERICAN INVESTMENTS, LLC (PL-1). NO APPEARANCE BY OR ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT. UPON MOTION OF COUNSEL FOR PROUD AMERICAN INVESTMENTS, LLC (PL-1) CAUSE IS CONTINUED TO 2/28/2006 AT 9:00 IN DIVISION B, MOJAVE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: MR. VOSEN TO PROVIDE NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
January 24, 2006 | Hearing |
4156 Case Management Conference (N40u) New Calendar |
|
January 24, 2006 | Hearing |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Woodward, Cory J. |
|
January 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
4156 Case Management Conference (N40u) New Calendar |
|
January 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
NP1430 Department: AM Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: JERRY VOSEN MAKES A SPECIAL APPEARANCE FOR MICHAEL JOEL KELLY ON BEHALF OF PROUD AMERICAN INVESTMENTS, LLC (PL-1). NO APPEARANCE BY OR ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT. UPON MOTION OF COUNSEL FOR PROUD AMERICAN INVESTMENTS, LLC (PL-1) CAUSE IS CONTINUED TO 2/28/2006 AT 9:00 IN DIVISION B, MOJAVE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. THE COURT ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: MR. VOSEN TO PROVIDE NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT. |
|
January 03, 2006 | Hearing |
Notice PER CCP 1161.2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.