Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
David Sandys, E Alan Stark, Gina Andersen, John H Gibbons, Leigh Jeter, (total of 11) See All filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Alan Bernhard Carlson, Jonathon Ross Giffen, against F. Warren Wayland, Hayashi & Wayland Accounting And Consulting, Llp, Hayashi & Wayland Administrative & Insurance Svcs Inc, Hayashi & Wayland Investment Services Llc, Hayashi & Wayland Retirement Plan Services, (total of 8) See All represented by James Forrest Hetherington, in the jurisdiction of Monterey County. This case was filed in Monterey County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited (06) |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMonterey County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice | |
September 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Request: Dismissal | |
April 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment: Notice of Entry (Civil) | |
April 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Order | |
April 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Answer/Response (No Fee) | |
February 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Cross-Complaint (Amended) (No Fee) | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Summons: Issued/Filed | |
February 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Cross-Complaint | |
January 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Order | |
January 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.