Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Credit Consulting Services, Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Macdonald Bryan, against Leah J. Rodriguez, in the jurisdiction of Monterey County. This case was filed in Monterey County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryOther Collections Limited (09) - Under 10,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMonterey County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs | |
January 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ: Execution (Issued) | |
November 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ: Execution (Filed) | |
May 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs | |
March 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Request: Enter Default | |
March 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Judgment: Default | |
March 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Request: Dismissal | |
February 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Summons: Issued/Filed | |
December 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.